+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ171ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote)(100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985399753
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor