+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ162ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received
- Laid on Speaker's table
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107576D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ162S1
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 18107576D-S1
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented 18106107D
- Referred to Committee on Rules