+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ154ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received
- Laid on Speaker's table
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented 18104808D
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor