+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ150ER)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 004755412
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2000: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor