+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ140ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 006324436-H1
- Taken up
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006324436-H1
- Agreed to by House with substitute (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 006324436-H1
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Communicated to House
- Committee substitute agreed to 001181436-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001181436-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 001181436-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 002590436
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2000: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor