+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ137ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House with substitute (95-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 020591406-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 020591406-H1
- Taken up
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 020591406-H1
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 029812406-E
- Rules suspended 40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 029812406