+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ13ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (16-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD6705633 (SJ13E)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed