+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ129ER)
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105358D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ129S1
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105358D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 12104482D
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor