+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ127ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (86-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 9-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (11-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 986020828
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 9-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (11-Y 4-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor