+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ127ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed