+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ119ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982745828-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 982745828
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor