+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ116ER)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Appointments
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 14104553D
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor