+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed LD4422613 (SJ116S1)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass
- No further action taken
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (33-Y 66-N)
- Conference report rejected by House (33-Y 66-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (voice vote)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (voice vote)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Benedetti, Goode, Houck
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Hall, Watkins, Cantor
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute with amendments
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute rejected
- Substitute by Del. Cranwell agreed to
- Floor substitute printed LD2340176 (SJ116H2)
- Amendments by Del. Reid agreed to
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amds.
- Agreed to by House w/sub. w/amds. (86-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 10-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4800613 (SJ116H1)
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (36-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed