+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105034D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1189 (Dance)
- Committee substitute printed 19105034D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
On July 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100087D