+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 877 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation Amendments #2,3 (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2, #3 (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (3-Y 37-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
- Communicated to Governor
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB999ER2)
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (0-Y 40-N)
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB999ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #2
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104373D-S1
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB970
- Committee substitute printed 11104373D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103545D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
April 6, 2011: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (3-Y 37-N)
April 6, 2011: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (0-Y 40-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor