+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 2
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Amendment by Senator Miller, J.C. agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB997E
- Printed as engrossed 098399275-E
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (7-Y 4-N)
On January 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098399275
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 2009: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
January 30, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2009: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2009: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2009: Reported from Transportation (7-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor