+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
On April 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB997ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 816 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 16-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (82-Y 16-N)
On April 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5017739-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD5017739-H1
- Passed House with substitute (87-Y 13-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage rejected by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed LD5017739-H1
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/sub. (18-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD5001819-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5001819-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD5001819-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed LD4880819
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 16-N)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from R. & I. N. w/sub. (18-Y 4-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor