+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 034819500-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 034819500
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2003: Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor