+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 074650740-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB997E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074650740
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor