+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
On March 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by R.&S.S. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 970027813