+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB995ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB995S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104903D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104903D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102142D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2011: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor