+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0096)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 96 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB992ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB992S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13103994D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13103994D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101996D
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor