+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 309 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB990ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/01 012297536
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor