+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1120)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1120 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB990ER)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 12-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 12-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 20109756D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Austin, Bulova, Plum
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Edwards, Newman, Ebbin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108583D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB990H1
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108583D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107493D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB990S1
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107493D-S1
- Incorporates SB984 (Newman)
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 20105451D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 12-N)
March 7, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2020: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
John S. Edwards
Type:
Primary Sponsor