+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
On March 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB988ER)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD0272665-E
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Domestic Relations/Juven.
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD0272665
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor