+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973573726
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 5-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor