+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 10/1/07)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB985ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 3-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077618116
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2007: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (36-Y 3-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor