+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB1222-Norment) by voice vote
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (SB1222-Norment) by voice vote
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104290D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB981S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104290D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103147D
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
February 1, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor