+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Continued to 2019 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB980E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 18105604D-E
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 18105604D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor