+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (9-Y 88-N)
- Read third time
- Defeated by House (9-Y 88-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N)
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed LD7723727
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (9-Y 88-N)
February 20, 1995: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N)
January 31, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
January 30, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1995: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor