+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985382655
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor