+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0918)
On March 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 918 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB979ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 031862500-H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 031862500-H1
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 031862500-H1
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. 030650536-S2
- Committee substitute agreed to 030650536-S2 (Finance)
- Reading of substitute waived (Finance)
- Committee substitute rejected 030641500-S1 (Courts)
- Reading of substitute waived (Courts)
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 030650536-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 030641500-S1
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 038791253