+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 772 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB979ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB979S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106353D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20106353D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 20105592D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
January 23, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
David R. Suetterlein
Type:
Primary Sponsor