+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106489D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB977S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106489D-S1
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105581D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor