+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 839 (effective 7/1/11)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB975ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB975ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB975S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104838D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104838D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102252D