+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Putney)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074610728
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor