+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB975ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 17101068D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB975E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101068D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2017: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor