+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB974ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11101360D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB974E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101360D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2011: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor