+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101296D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
February 3, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor