+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 239 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB973ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 971612661-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 971612661-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 971612661-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 971540661
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor