+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
On March 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 582 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB972ER)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (34-Y 4-N)
- Rec. of conf. report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (27-Y 12-N)
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House insisted on amendments
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Whipple, Couric, Hawkins
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Van Yahres, Connally, Bloxom
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Sen. Whipple agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 970050758-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds. (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 970050758