+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass in Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Black, Howell, Northam
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (9-Y 28-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105016D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB971H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13105016D-H1
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending question ordered (34-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Floor substitute printed 13104652D-S1 (Black)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Black agreed to 13104652D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB971S1
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101234D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health