+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB970S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106398D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106398D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 18105710D
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor