+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107667D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106049D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB969S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106049D-S1
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105709D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
February 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor