+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB969ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 033143212-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Houck agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 033143212
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2003: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor