+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 568 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB967ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 031166560-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 031166560-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 031166560-S1
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 031108560
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2003: Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor