+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 20-N)
- Communicated to Governor
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB964ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- Title replaced 18107633D-H1
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107633D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB964H1
- Passed House with substitute (51-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107633D-H1
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104904D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (9)
April 18, 2018: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 20-N)
March 7, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor