+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB963ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB963S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104582D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104582D-S1
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101017D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor