+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393)
On March 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 393 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB962ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (24-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/01 014567200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2001: Reported from General Laws with amds (24-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2001: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor