+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
On March 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 580 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB961ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 975739661
+ − Votes (9)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor